IL HB5704 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that every driver shall report to the Secretary of State any medical condition that is likely to cause seizures within 10 days of the driver becoming aware of the condition. Includes seizures within the standard of physical disorders characterized by momentary or prolonged lapses of consciousness or control which constitute a limitation on a person's ability to operate a motor vehicle or causes the person to be a driving hazard. Provides that a person commits reckless driving when he or she knowingly drives a vehicle when that person has, within the preceding 3 months, experienced a loss of consciousness or a seizure that would interfere with the ability to safely operate a vehicle, unless the person's condition is controlled by medical treatment or medication. Effective January 1, 2017.
Title
VEH CD-SEIZURES WHILE DRIVING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) - Referred to Criminal Law |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-001-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-018-002 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-116.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-903 | Amended Code | Citation Text |