IL HB5698 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the imposition of term limits by referendum, ordinance, or otherwise must be prospective. Provides that elective office held prior to the effective date of any term limit imposed by a municipality shall not prohibit a person otherwise eligible from running for or holding elective office in that municipality. Provides that term limits imposed in a manner inconsistent with the applicable provisions are invalid. Provides that these provisions apply to all term limits imposed by a municipality by referendum, ordinance, or otherwise passed on or after November 8, 2016. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-MUNICIPAL TERM LIMITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-11-28SenateThird Reading - Lost; 028-017-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018
2018-11-27SenateSecond Reading
2018-11-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-11-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-11-27SenateDo Pass Executive; 011-004-000
2018-11-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-11-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-11-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-11-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-11-14SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-11-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-11-14SenateArrive in Senate
2018-11-14HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-007-001
2018-11-14House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-22HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-22HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Cities & Villages Committee; Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-07HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6553.1-10-17New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback