IL HB5693 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that traps used in the taking of mammals protected by the Code, for which an open trapping season has been established, shall be marked or tagged with metal tags or inscribed in lettering giving the name and address of the owner, or the name and customer identification number issued by the Department of Natural Resources, and absence of such mark or tag shall be prima facie evidence that such trap or traps are illegally used and the trap or traps shall be confiscated and disposed of as directed by the Department. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-TRAPPING TAGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-19HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52053.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback