IL HB5693 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0964
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0964
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that traps used in the taking of mammals protected by the Code, for which an open trapping season has been established, shall be marked or tagged with metal tags or inscribed in lettering giving the name and address of the owner, or the name and customer identification number issued by the Department of Natural Resources, and absence of such mark or tag shall be prima facie evidence that such trap or traps are illegally used and the trap or traps shall be confiscated and disposed of as directed by the Department. Effective immediately.
Title
WILDLIFE-TRAPPING TAGS
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0964 |
2018-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2018 |
2018-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |