IL HB5690 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Hotel Jobs Recovery Grant Program Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall establish the Hotel Jobs Recovery Grant Program for the purpose of providing direct relief to hotels impacted by the COVID-19 pandemic. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall award a one-time grant to the operator of each hotel in the State in an amount equal to $1,500 for each room in the hotel. Sets forth the permitted uses for grant funds awarded under the Act. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides for emergency rulemaking. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
DCEO-HOTEL GRANT PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5690&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5690.htm |