IL HB5690 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0963
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0963
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends "An Act to provide for the sale of the Kaskaskia Commons, upon the island of Kaskaskia, in the county of Randolph, and to create a permanent fund for the inhabitants of said island out of the proceeds of said sale, and to punish any person failing to comply with the provisions thereof", filed June 16, 1909 ("the 1909 Act"). Adds language transferring all powers and duties previously granted the Land Commissioners of the Commons of Kaskaskia, or of the Kaskaskia Commons Permanent Fund, to the Kaskaskia Island Drainage and Levee District. Provides that assets held by the Kaskaskia Commons Permanent Fund are transferred to the District, that the assets shall be used by the District for proper purposes as authorized and required by the Illinois Drainage Code or for specified educational purposes, and that following the transfer of all assets to the District, the Kaskaskia Commons Permanent Fund shall be closed. Repeals the existing substantive provisions of the 1909 Act. Amends the School Code by making conforming changes.
Title
KASKASKIA COMMONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0963 |
2018-08-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 5-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 5-28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |