IL HB5689 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Coal Mining Act. Provides that a coal mine operator must provide caches of additional self-contained self-rescues devices along the mine's primary and secondary escape ways (rather than 30 self-contained self-rescuer devices in each cache located within a mine). Provides that each cache shall have a minimum of one self-contained self-rescuer device for every person who will be inby the cache. Provides that cache locations shall be spaced along each escape way at a 30 minute travel distance. Provides alternate distances for caches if an operator chooses not to use a walk study. Provides that outby rescue chambers must be provided at distances and locations in the mine's emergency response plan and approved by the Mining Board. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COAL MINING-SELF RESCUERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HouseBill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar Amendatory Veto
2018-08-17HouseGovernor Amendatory Veto
2018-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-08SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-03-02HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-03-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22570511.08Amended CodeCitation Text
22570511.09Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback