IL HB5686 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0695
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends various Acts to conform statutes to the agency reorganization under Executive Order Number 1 (2017), which abolished the Historic Preservation Agency and transferred its powers, duties, and functions to the Department of Natural Resources, except for functions transferred by law from the Historic Preservation Agency to the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum Agency. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNR-HISTORIC PRESERVATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0695
2018-08-03HouseEffective Date August 3, 2018
2018-08-03HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018
2018-05-03SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2034051Amended CodeCitation Text
20340511Amended CodeCitation Text
20340512Amended CodeCitation Text
20340513Amended CodeCitation Text
20340514Amended CodeCitation Text
20340515Amended CodeCitation Text
20340516Amended CodeCitation Text
20340519Amended CodeCitation Text
2034052Amended CodeCitation Text
20340522Amended CodeCitation Text
2034053Repealed CodeCitation Text
2034053.1New CodeSee Bill Text
20340534Repealed CodeCitation Text
20340535Amended CodeCitation Text
2034054Repealed CodeCitation Text
2034054.5New CodeSee Bill Text
2034055Repealed CodeCitation Text
2034056Amended CodeCitation Text
2034058Amended CodeCitation Text
20341015Amended CodeCitation Text
2034102Amended CodeCitation Text
2034103Amended CodeCitation Text
2034104Amended CodeCitation Text
2034105Amended CodeCitation Text
2034151Amended CodeCitation Text
2034152Amended CodeCitation Text
2034153Amended CodeCitation Text
2034201Amended CodeCitation Text
2034203Amended CodeCitation Text
2034204Amended CodeCitation Text
2034205Amended CodeCitation Text
2034301Amended CodeCitation Text
2034302Amended CodeCitation Text
2034303Amended CodeCitation Text
2034351Amended CodeCitation Text
20343510Amended CodeCitation Text
20343511Amended CodeCitation Text
2034353Amended CodeCitation Text
2034353.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2034353.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2034355Amended CodeCitation Text
2034356Amended CodeCitation Text
2034357Amended CodeCitation Text
2034358Amended CodeCitation Text
2034359Amended CodeCitation Text
20344013Amended CodeCitation Text
20344014Amended CodeCitation Text
20344015Amended CodeCitation Text
20344016Amended CodeCitation Text
2034403Amended CodeCitation Text
2034404Amended CodeCitation Text
2034405Amended CodeCitation Text
2034408Amended CodeCitation Text
2034409Amended CodeCitation Text
20347530Amended CodeCitation Text
20347560Amended CodeCitation Text
20400310Amended CodeCitation Text
20400320Amended CodeCitation Text
20500010Amended CodeCitation Text
208011-45New CodeSee Bill Text
208302-1Amended CodeCitation Text
208401Amended CodeCitation Text
208602aAmended CodeCitation Text
208603aAmended CodeCitation Text
208604aAmended CodeCitation Text
208605aAmended CodeCitation Text
23556-15Amended CodeCitation Text
301453Amended CodeCitation Text
301602Amended CodeCitation Text
307501-3Amended CodeCitation Text
353015Amended CodeCitation Text
353030Amended CodeCitation Text
35305Amended CodeCitation Text
355221Amended CodeCitation Text
54125-15Amended CodeCitation Text
54125-20Amended CodeCitation Text
54125-25Amended CodeCitation Text
54125-30Amended CodeCitation Text
54125-35Amended CodeCitation Text
54125-5Amended CodeCitation Text
551202Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-31012Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-31017Amended CodeCitation Text
60554-201.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback