IL HB5683 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Provides that a non-veteran spouse shall only have the same priority for admission to a Veterans Home as a veteran if the non-veteran spouse and his or her veteran spouse are admitted at the same to live together at the Veterans Home. Makes corresponding changes in provisions concerning the admission of a spouse to the Illinois Veterans Homes at Anna or Quincy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS HOMES-SPOUSES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-001
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass as Amended Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-15SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2028052.01Amended CodeCitation Text
2028052.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback