IL HB5682 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Provides that the Department of Veterans' Affairs may make expenditures from a members benefits fund, subject to approval by the Director of Veterans' Affairs, for recognition and appreciation programs for volunteers who assist the Veterans Homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS-MEMBERS BENEFIT FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-23HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2028052.01aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback