IL HB5682 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Provides that the Department of Veterans' Affairs may make expenditures from a members benefits fund, subject to approval by the Director of Veterans' Affairs, for recognition and appreciation programs for volunteers who assist the Veterans Homes.
Title
VETERANS-MEMBERS BENEFIT FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2805 | 2.01a | Amended Code | Citation Text |