IL HB5676 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code, the Labor and Storage Lien Act, and the Labor and Storage Lien (Small Account) Act. Provides that if a towing service is induced by a payment to release a vehicle and the payment subsequently fails and remains unsatisfied for 30 calendar days after sending certified mail notice to the person or entity having made the failed payment and the registered owner, then the person having made the failed payment and the registered owner shall be jointly and severally liable to the towing service for the amount of the failed payment plus a reasonable failed payment fee and collection costs. Deletes language regarding a relocator becoming a holder in due course upon receipt of a properly signed credit card receipt. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOWING SERVICE-FAILED PAYMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625518a-501Amended CodeCitation Text
62554-203Amended CodeCitation Text
62554-216Amended CodeCitation Text
770451.5Amended CodeCitation Text
770501.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback