IL HB5669 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Government Bankruptcy Neutral Evaluation Act. Makes legislative findings. Defines terms. Authorizes a local public entity to initiate a neutral evaluation process if that entity is or likely will become unable to meet its financial obligations as and when those obligations are due or become due and owing. Sets forth procedures concerning the selection and qualifications of an evaluator, the evaluation process, cessation of an evaluation, declaration of a fiscal emergency, and liabilities. Further provides that any meetings or writings made in connection with the neutral evaluation process shall be prohibited from public viewing. Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that a public body may hold closed meetings when the meetings are made pursuant to the Local Government Bankruptcy Neutral Evaluation Act. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that all records and information prohibited from being disclosed pursuant to the Local Government Bankruptcy Neutral Evaluation Act are exempt from inspection and copying.
Title
LOCGOV BANKRUPTCY NEUTRAL EVAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-24 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2012-04-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2012 |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5669&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5669.htm |