IL HB5669 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Secretary of State Special Needs Alert Act. Establishes the special needs alert database to ensure persons with disabilities, special needs, or both have the same access to public safety services as provided to all citizens. Provides that the special needs alert database shall be connected to the Secretary of State vehicle, driver, and identification card database in a manner that allows public safety workers to access information relating to the disability or special need of individual. Provides that any person holding a vehicle registration, State identification card, driver's license, instruction permit, or any other type of driving permit issued by the Secretary of State shall be afforded the opportunity to provide the Secretary of State, in a manner and form designated by the Secretary of State, disability or special needs information relating to the holder or any disabled or special needs individual that does not hold identification issued by the Secretary of State and for which the holder is the primary caregiver. Provides that the Secretary of State shall adopt rules to implement this Act. Contains provisions concerning data control and accessibility, confidentiality, liability, and duration, among others. Effective immediately.
Title
SOS-SPECIAL NEEDS ALERT
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Coulson [R] | Rep. Tom Cross [R] | Rep. David Leitch [R] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] |
Rep. Timothy Schmitz [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1168 | |
2010-07-22 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-22 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Disability Services Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2010-03-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Disability Services Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-03 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Disability Services Committee | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Disability Services Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |