IL HB5665 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that the Authority may issue, sell, and deliver additional Working Cash Notes before July 1, 2020 (rather than July 1, 2018) that are over and above and in addition to the $100,000,000 authorization. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RTA-ISSUANCE OF BONDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7036154.04Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback