IL HB5662 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, with exceptions, a school bus may not idle in excess of 3 minutes in a 60 minute period. Provides that a person convicted of a violation of the new provision is guilty of a petty offense and shall be fined $100 for the first conviction and $500 for a second or subsequent conviction within any 12 month period. Makes a corresponding change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-SCHOOL BUS IDLING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseRemains in Environment
2018-04-09HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Environment; 009-008-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1429Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-1429.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback