IL HB5660 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Assistance Fraud Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Increases the criminal and civil penalties for medical assistance fraud committed by individuals and corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID FRAUD-PENALTIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseTo HS Medicaid Subcommittee
2018-04-10HouseRemains in Human Services Committee
2018-04-10HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Human Services Committee; 005-002-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30558A-11Amended CodeCitation Text
30558A-16Amended CodeCitation Text
30558A-17Amended CodeCitation Text
30558A-2.5Amended CodeCitation Text
30558A-6Amended CodeCitation Text
30558A-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback