IL HB5652 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Expands the definition of "computer" to include equipment of cloud-based networks of remote servers hosted on the Internet to store, manage, and process data. Makes the definition of "computer" apply to multiple provisions under the computer fraud subdivision of the Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM LAW-CLOUD COMPUTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-12HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee;
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 006-000-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-12HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720516D-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-52.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-55Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback