IL HB5651 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, Service Use Tax Act, Service Occupation Tax Act, and Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Imposes a 2% surcharge on firearm ammunition. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Safe Schools and Healthy Learning Environments Grant Fund. Requires the 2% surcharge to be deposited into the Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the State Board of Education to make grants as part of the Safe Schools and Healthy Learning Environments Grant Program. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TAX-AMMUNITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5651&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5651.htm |