IL HB5649 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0812
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0812
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that Illinois Fire Fighters' Memorial license plates may be affixed to motorcycles.
Title
VEH CD-FIRE FIGHTER PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0812 |
2016-08-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-13 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-634 | Amended Code | Citation Text |