IL HB5635 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person who records the scene of a vehicular accident with an electronic communication device while driving a motor vehicle commits an offense against traffic regulations governing the movement of vehicles and shall be fined $500.
Title
VEH CD-RECORDING VEH ACCIDENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-001-001 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-002-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-610.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |