IL HB5632 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that an ambulance or rescue vehicle shall operate a siren and lamp or lamps only when it is reasonably necessary to warn pedestrians and other drivers of the approach thereof while responding to an emergency call or transporting a patient who presents a combination of circumstances resulting in a need for immediate medical intervention that is beyond the capabilities of the emergency responders using the available supplies and equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-EMS-SIREN & LAMPS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 93 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 093-013-001
2018-05-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2018
2018-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-05-24SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-23SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-22SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-17SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1421Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback