IL HB5632 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cemetery Oversight Act. Provides that a cemetery authority and a cemetery authority claiming a partial exemption shall provide access to the cemetery every day of the year from sunrise to sunset each day and shall have an employee on site at all times during these hours of operation to assist cemetery visitors. Effective on July 1, 2014.
Title
CEMETERY-HOURS OF OPERATION
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Edward Acevedo [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-006-000 |
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly Burke |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2014-02-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 411 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 411 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |