IL HB5629 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Motion Withdrawn Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that the board of trustees of a community college district may enter into a contract for goods or services procured from a competitively bid group purchase contract without adhering to the competitively bid contract requirements under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY COLLEGE-CONTRACTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Executive Committee; Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108053-27.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback