IL HB5627 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Makes changes to provisions concerning the licensure powers of the State Board of Education, the State Educator Preparation and Licensure Board (including adding 2 members), types of licenses (including removing and adding certain endorsements on an educator license with stipulations), endorsements on professional educator licenses, educator testing, the minimum requirements for educators trained in other states or countries, application fees, license renewal, the Alternative Educator Licensure Program for Teachers, alternative route to superintendent endorsement programs, and the approval of educator preparation institutions. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-EDUCATOR LICENSURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-03-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-10Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-105Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-20Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-25Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-30Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-35Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-40Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-45Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-5Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-50Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-55Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback