IL HB5627 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0596
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0596
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Makes changes to provisions concerning the licensure powers of the State Board of Education, the State Educator Preparation and Licensure Board (including adding 2 members), types of licenses (including removing and adding certain endorsements on an educator license with stipulations), endorsements on professional educator licenses, educator testing, the minimum requirements for educators trained in other states or countries, application fees, license renewal, the Alternative Educator Licensure Program for Teachers, alternative route to superintendent endorsement programs, and the approval of educator preparation institutions. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
SCH CD-EDUCATOR LICENSURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0596 |
2018-06-29 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2018 |
2018-06-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |