IL HB5626 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Requires an alternative retail electric supplier to annually submit certain rate information from the prior 12-month period to the Illinois Commerce Commission and the Attorney General. Requires an alternative retail electric supplier's marketing materials to contain the current utility price. Provides that an alternative retail electric supplier that is certified to serve residential retail customers shall not charge customers who receive financial assistance from the Illinois Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program an amount that exceeds the public utility supply price. Provides that existing agreements between an alternative retail electric supplier and an Illinois Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program recipient that charge the customer an amount that exceeds the public utility price shall not be renewed upon the expiration of the existing agreement. Provides that the annual report the Director of Retail Market Development submits shall include the information alternative retail electric suppliers submitted concerning rates from the prior 12-month period. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that a violation of the provisions concerning obligations of alternative retail electric suppliers in the Public Utilities Act and its administrative rules constitutes a violation under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ALTERNATIVE ENERGY RATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 020-000-000
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220516-115AAmended CodeCitation Text
220520-110Amended CodeCitation Text
8155052EEAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback