IL HB5616 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Violence Reduction Funding Act of 2018. Requires the Secretary of the Department of Human Services to make grants to community-based organizations for the purpose of carrying out community-based violence reduction programs. Provides that the programs shall reflect strong community involvement and provide specified services including: (i) youth services; (ii) trauma-informed counseling services; (iii) public awareness campaigns; and (iv) job readiness training programs. Contains provisions concerning eligible activities; selection criteria; eligible entities; application requirements; and reporting requirements. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL VIOLENCE REDUCTION ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback