IL HB5613 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires school districts to develop and adopt a trauma response protocol by the 2019-2020 school year. Requires the trauma response protocol to include long-term responses to a traumatic incident, long-term care and counseling, and community engagement. Allows school districts to partner with local community providers in establishing and implementing the protocol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TRAUMA RESPONSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.67New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.60New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback