IL HB5611 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Department of Innovation and Technology Act to codify the changes made in Executive Order 2016-001. Creates the Department of Innovation and Technology. Abolishes the Information Technology Office (also known as the Office of the Chief Information Officer) within the Office of the Governor and transfers its functions, personnel, and property to Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides for the transfer of information technology functions, including related personnel and property, from specified State agencies, boards, and commissions to the Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides for the powers and responsibilities of the Department of Innovation and Technology, including specified programs and initiatives. Provides for the appointment of the Secretary and Assistant Secretary of Innovation and Technology by the Governor, with the advice and consent of the Senate. Provides that the Secretary shall serve as the Chief Information Officer of the State. Amends various Act and Codes to make conforming changes. Repeals Sections in the Department of Central Management Services Law. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEPT-INNOVATION AND TECHNOLOGY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2018-04-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2029052.5Amended CodeCitation Text
20392110Amended CodeCitation Text
20392115Amended CodeCitation Text
20392120Repealed CodeCitation Text
2039215Amended CodeCitation Text
2039217New CodeSee Bill Text
2040535.3Amended CodeCitation Text
20405405-10Amended CodeCitation Text
20405405-20Repealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-250Repealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-255Repealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-260Repealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-265Repealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-270Amended CodeCitation Text
20405405-410Amended CodeCitation Text
2040567.18Amended CodeCitation Text
20512Amended CodeCitation Text
2052.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2053Amended CodeCitation Text
2054Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-195New CodeSee Bill Text
2055-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-357New CodeSee Bill Text
2055-605Amended CodeCitation Text
20605605-1007Amended CodeCitation Text
20605605-680Amended CodeCitation Text
2257321-110Amended CodeCitation Text
301056p-1Amended CodeCitation Text
301056p-2Amended CodeCitation Text
301058.16aAmended CodeCitation Text
301058.16bAmended CodeCitation Text
3050020-60Amended CodeCitation Text
3070710Amended CodeCitation Text
305512-10.10Amended CodeCitation Text
4051-160Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-110Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-106Amended CodeCitation Text
72064920Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback