IL HB5611 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Department of Innovation and Technology Act to codify the changes made in Executive Order 2016-001. Creates the Department of Innovation and Technology. Abolishes the Information Technology Office (also known as the Office of the Chief Information Officer) within the Office of the Governor and transfers its functions, personnel, and property to Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides for the transfer of information technology functions, including related personnel and property, from specified State agencies, boards, and commissions to the Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides for the powers and responsibilities of the Department of Innovation and Technology, including specified programs and initiatives. Provides for the appointment of the Secretary and Assistant Secretary of Innovation and Technology by the Governor, with the advice and consent of the Senate. Provides that the Secretary shall serve as the Chief Information Officer of the State. Amends various Act and Codes to make conforming changes. Repeals Sections in the Department of Central Management Services Law. Effective immediately.
Title
DEPT-INNOVATION AND TECHNOLOGY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0611 |
2018-07-20 | House | Effective Date July 20, 2018 |
2018-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2018-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |