IL HB5610 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that no contract for services made by a State agency under the Code shall be entered into without funding being appropriated and available for such contracted services as follows: (1) for a contract to be performed within a single fiscal year, the funding required for the contract must be available within the funds appropriated for that fiscal year, after taking into account all other recurring and anticipated expenses of the State agency for that fiscal year; and (2) for a contract to be performed over 2 or more fiscal years, the funding required for each fiscal year of the contract must be equal to the amount available within the funds appropriated for the first fiscal year of the contract, after taking into account all other recurring and anticipated expenses of the State agency for that first fiscal year. Provides that if a Chief Procurement Officer, or any other person on behalf of a State agency, enters into any contract for services without funding, upon the signing of the contract, that person commits fraud, and is guilty of a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that if the person signing the contract on behalf of the State agency is a lawyer or a certified public accountant, he or she shall also be subject to a revocation of his or her license. Provides that the funding requirement does not apply to contracts entered into on behalf of a State agency which are intended to be funded by grants or other non-appropriated funding provided by a federal or private entity to support a project or program administered by the contracting State agency.
Title
PROCUREMENT-CONTRACT FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5610&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5610.htm |