IL HB5609 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In a provision concerning the Community Care Program, establishes the following rate increases in the wages paid by vendors to their employees who provide homemaker services: on July 1, 2018, rates shall be increased to $19.89 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; on July 1, 2019, rates shall be increased to $21.49 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; on July 1, 2020, rates shall be increased to $23.09 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; and on July 1, 2021, rates shall be increased to $24.69 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, any paid time off or payments for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation shall not be reduced in relation to the rate increases established in this provision. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY CARE-HOMEMAKER WAGES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201054.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback