IL HB5609 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In a provision concerning the Community Care Program, establishes the following rate increases in the wages paid by vendors to their employees who provide homemaker services: on July 1, 2018, rates shall be increased to $19.89 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; on July 1, 2019, rates shall be increased to $21.49 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; on July 1, 2020, rates shall be increased to $23.09 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour; and on July 1, 2021, rates shall be increased to $24.69 for the purpose of increasing wages by at least $1 per hour. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, any paid time off or payments for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation shall not be reduced in relation to the rate increases established in this provision. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
COMMUNITY CARE-HOMEMAKER WAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5609&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5609.htm |