IL HB5606 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipal waterworks system, water supply system, or combined waterworks and sewerage system shall offer reduced rates to consumers living in a household at or below 150% of the federal poverty guidelines. Provides that upon the submission of a signed affidavit and evidence verifying the consumer's household income, the municipal water system shall grant a 25% discount on all subsequent charges for water service. Provides that a municipality may require annual recertification of income levels for qualifying consumers and that it may not charge to qualifying consumers any fees related to the disconnection or reconnection of water service. Limits home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act requiring implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI-LOW INCOME WATER RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | To Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-129-6.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-130-3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-139-8.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5606&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5606.htm |