IL HB5605 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipal waterworks system, water supply system, or combined waterworks and sewerage system may not charge consumers for the provision of water service in an amount that is determined by a court to be unconscionably extreme or represents a gross disparity between the cost to the municipality of providing the water service and the cost charged to the consumer. Limits home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act requiring implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-UNCONSCIONABLE WATER RATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseTo Local Government Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text
65511-129-6.5New CodeSee Bill Text
65511-130-3.5New CodeSee Bill Text
65511-139-8.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback