IL HB5604 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality may not operate an emergency sewer repair program. Provides that a municipality that maintains and repairs a waterworks system, a water supply system, or a combined waterworks and sewerage system must publish on its website a plan for the maintenance and repair of underground water service lines (and sewerage systems in a combined waterworks and sewerage system). Provides that the plan must detail any scheduled or foreseeable maintenance and repair to be completed over the following 5-year period, as well as any scheduled or foreseeable maintenance and repair to be completed over the following 10-year period. Provides that physical copies of the plan must be made available for inspection and review at a municipal office. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-EMERGENCY SEWER REPAIR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseTo Local Government Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-109-5New CodeSee Bill Text
65511-129-8.5New CodeSee Bill Text
65511-130-8.5New CodeSee Bill Text
65511-139-2.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback