IL HB5603 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality shall provide free snow removal at the residence of a person with a disability, senior, or veteran when one inch or more of snow accumulates on the ground. Provides that a person with a disability, senior, or veteran may receive free snow removal under these provisions only after he or she registers with the municipality providing the following information to the municipality: identification; proof of current residence; and, if applicable, signing a statement affirming that he or she is a person with a disability or a veteran. Defines terms. Limits home rule powers. Repeals the provisions 3 years after the effective date of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-FREE SNOW REMOVAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Local Government Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-30-8.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback