IL HB5599 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law or administrative rule to the contrary, beginning in fiscal year 2019, the specified threshold for working families must be no less than 185% of the then-current federal poverty level for each family size. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD CARE-INCOME THRESHOLD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-002-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 075-031-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-26HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-10HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-001-000
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30559A-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback