IL HB5599 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0916
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0916
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law or administrative rule to the contrary, beginning in fiscal year 2019, the specified threshold for working families must be no less than 185% of the then-current federal poverty level for each family size. Effective immediately.
Title
CHILD CARE-INCOME THRESHOLD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0916 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-017-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-002-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 075-031-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-10 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-001-000 |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |