IL HB5598 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall issue distinctive registration plates for covered farm vehicles. Provides that a $10 surcharge shall be collected, in addition to all applicable fees for the issuance of a registration plate. Provides that the surcharge shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that a designation as a covered farm vehicle shall not limit the purposes for which that vehicle may otherwise be used. Modifies the definition of "covered farm vehicle". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISTINCT PLATE-COVERED FARM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625518b-101Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-412Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback