IL HB5597 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits custodial sexual misconduct when he or she is an employee of a law enforcement agency and engages in sexual conduct or sexual penetration with a person who is in the custody of a law enforcement agency. Provides that any person convicted of violating the offense immediately shall forfeit his or her employment with a law enforcement agency. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CUSTODIAL SEXUAL MISCONDUCT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720511-9.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback