IL HB5593 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Telephone Solicitations Act. Provides that a live operator soliciting the sale of goods or services shall immediately state the name and telephone number (rather than the name) of the business or organization being represented. Provides that a live operator shall disclose his or her mailing address and the business or organization being represented on any website owned or operated by the live operator and on any written communications to a customer. Provides that the provisions of the Act shall not apply to a live operator who makes a residential marketing telephone call in response to a customer's telephone call or contact with the website of the business or organization being represented if the customer affirmatively requests a follow-up telephone call or other contact from the business or organization being represented. Provides that specified violations of the Act are a Class C misdemeanor.
Title
TELEPHONE SOLICITATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 413 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 413 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 413 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |