IL HB5593 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Design-Build for Public Schools Act. Defines terms. Provides that a school district shall, for each public project, make a written determination as to whether it is in the best interests of the school district to enter into a design-build contract for that project. Specifies factors to be considered in making the determination. Provides that if a school district elects to use a design-build delivery method under the Act, it must issue a notice of intent to receive proposals for a project no less than 14 days before issuing the request for proposals. Specifies requirements for the request for proposals. Requires a school district that elects to use the design-build delivery method to establish a committee to evaluate and select the design-build entity, which shall consist of no less than 5 members but no more than 7 members and shall include no less than one licensed design professional. Requires a school district to use a 2-phase procedure for the selection of a design-build entity; specifies the criteria for each phase. Provides that a school district may award the contract to the highest overall ranked entity. Repeals the Act on July 1, 2023. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DESIGN-BUILD PUBLIC SCH ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-05-29SenateDo Pass Education; 008-000-000
2018-05-28SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-28SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-28SenateArrive in Senate
2018-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-001-000
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-001-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback