IL HB5588 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to the State Board of Education developing recognition standards for student performance and school improvement, removes provisions providing for a Multiple Measure Index in determining standards for student performance. Changes references from the "No Child Left Behind Act of 2001" to the "Every Student Succeeds Act". Provides that, beginning in fiscal year 2018, the State Board of Education may identify a school district as eligible for targeted and comprehensive services under the federal Every Student Succeeds Act. Requires a 21st Century Community Learning Center Grant Program to provide grants to support whole child-focused (rather than academically focused) after-school programs that are aligned with the regular academic programs of a school and the academic needs of students who attend a high-poverty, low-performing school. Requires the State Board of Education to administer a climate survey to provide feedback from, at minimum, students in grades 4 through 12 and teachers on the instructional environment within a school. Repeals provisions governing the Multiple Measure Index and Annual Measurable Objectives, class size reduction grant programs, and highly qualified teachers under the federal No Child Left Behind Act of 2001. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-EVERY STUDENT SUCCEEDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 010-000-000
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.39Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-21.3aAmended CodeCitation Text
105510-29Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.136Repealed CodeCitation Text
10552-3.153Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.25aAmended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.25dRepealed CodeCitation Text
10552-3.25nAmended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.52AAmended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.61aAmended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.64a-5Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-200Repealed CodeCitation Text
105534-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.24Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.31Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback