IL HB5580 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Behavior Analyst Licensing Act. Provides for licensure of licensed behavior analyst and licensed assistant behavior analyst. Creates the Advisory Board of Behavior Analyst. Provides qualifications for licensure application. Establishes the powers and duties of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, including, but not limited to, adopting rules setting forth minimum standards for licensure, taking disciplinary or non-disciplinary actions and authorizing examinations. Provides for grounds for disciplinary actions. Provides for civil and criminal penalties for violations of this Act. Creates provisions concerning hearings, including record of proceedings, appointment of hearing officers, and rehearings. Provides for judicial review of all final administrative decisions of the Department. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Provides that the Behavior Analyst Licensing Act repeals on January 1, 2029. Effective immediately.
Title
BEHAVIOR ANALYST-LICENSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-002-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5580&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5580.htm |