IL HB5573 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. Requires the governing board of each public university and community college district to deem an individual admitted to the United States as a refugee or an individual who has special immigrant status an Illinois resident for tuition purposes. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
HIGHER ED-IN-STATE TUITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 7e-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 520 | 8d-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 660 | 5-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 665 | 10-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 670 | 15-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 675 | 20-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 680 | 25-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 685 | 30-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 690 | 35-88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 6-4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5573&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5573.htm |