IL HB5573 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0961
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a crime victim shall be allowed to present an oral or written statement in any case in which: (1) a juvenile has been adjudicated delinquent for a violent crime after a bench or jury trial; or (2) the petition alleged the commission of a violent crime and the juvenile has been adjudicated delinquent under a plea agreement of a crime that is not a violent crime. Amends the Rights of Crime Victims and Witnesses Act. Makes changes to the definitions of "sentence", "sentencing", and "court proceeding". Defines "status hearing" and "support person". Provides that a party who intends to call an advocate as a witness at trial must seek permission of the court before the subpoena is issued. Provides that the party must file a written motion at least 90 days before trial that sets forth specifically the issues on which the advocate's testimony is sought and an offer of proof regarding: (1) the content of the anticipated testimony of the advocate; and (2) the relevance, admissibility, and materiality of the anticipated testimony in sufficient time to allow the court to rule and the victim to seek appellate review. Provides that if a victim has asserted the right to have a support person present at the court proceedings, the victim shall provide the name of the person the victim has chosen to be the victim's support person to the prosecuting attorney, who shall provide the name to defendant. Provides that if the defendant intends to call the support person as a witness at trial, the defendant must seek permission of the court before a subpoena is issued. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the court shall allow a victim to make an oral statement if the victim is present in the courtroom and requests to make an oral statement. Provides that an oral statement includes the victim or a representative of the victim reading the written statement. Provides that victim and any person making an oral statement shall not be put under oath or subject to cross-examination. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIME VICTIM RIGHTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-19HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0961
2018-08-19HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-19HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-05-21SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-18SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-705Amended CodeCitation Text
7251203Amended CodeCitation Text
7251204.5Amended CodeCitation Text
7251206Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-2-4Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5573&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5573.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5573eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5573enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0961.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5573ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5573ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5573sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5573_04262018_033000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB5573_05252018_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5573sam001_05312018_085000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback