IL HB5573 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0961
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0961
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a crime victim shall be allowed to present an oral or written statement in any case in which: (1) a juvenile has been adjudicated delinquent for a violent crime after a bench or jury trial; or (2) the petition alleged the commission of a violent crime and the juvenile has been adjudicated delinquent under a plea agreement of a crime that is not a violent crime. Amends the Rights of Crime Victims and Witnesses Act. Makes changes to the definitions of "sentence", "sentencing", and "court proceeding". Defines "status hearing" and "support person". Provides that a party who intends to call an advocate as a witness at trial must seek permission of the court before the subpoena is issued. Provides that the party must file a written motion at least 90 days before trial that sets forth specifically the issues on which the advocate's testimony is sought and an offer of proof regarding: (1) the content of the anticipated testimony of the advocate; and (2) the relevance, admissibility, and materiality of the anticipated testimony in sufficient time to allow the court to rule and the victim to seek appellate review. Provides that if a victim has asserted the right to have a support person present at the court proceedings, the victim shall provide the name of the person the victim has chosen to be the victim's support person to the prosecuting attorney, who shall provide the name to defendant. Provides that if the defendant intends to call the support person as a witness at trial, the defendant must seek permission of the court before a subpoena is issued. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the court shall allow a victim to make an oral statement if the victim is present in the courtroom and requests to make an oral statement. Provides that an oral statement includes the victim or a representative of the victim reading the written statement. Provides that victim and any person making an oral statement shall not be put under oath or subject to cross-examination. Makes other changes.
Title
CRIME VICTIM RIGHTS
Sponsors
Rep. Christian Mitchell [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] |
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0961 |
2018-08-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 120 | 4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 120 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-2-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |