IL HB5572 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the School District Debt Control and Taxpayer Protection Act. Provides that a school district may not refinance debt past the repayment period of the debt when issued, may not issue debt to be serviced over a period of greater than 20 years, and may not issue capital appreciation bonds. Sets forth provisions calculating and establishing a debt limit and prohibiting new debt. Requires specified bond referendum and bond issuance information to be provided. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL DISTRICT DEBT CONTROL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 13 N: 77 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Lost 013-077-001
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback